EP1345715 - FORGING PRESS COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE ON THE MATRIX SIDE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nedschroef Herentals N.V. Brigandsstraat 10 2200 Herentals / BE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOORELBEKE, Luc Cogelsdreef 31 B-2288 Grobbendonk / BE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Alber, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01985418.1 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP14905 | Priority number, date | DE2000163154 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063154 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0249788 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345715 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345715 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21J13/03, B21J9/02, B21K27/04, B21J13/14 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B21K1/46 (EP,US);
B21J13/03 (EP,US);
B21J13/14 (EP,US);
B21J9/02 (EP,US);
B21J9/022 (EP,US);
B21K27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | SCHMIEDEPRESSE MIT STELLVORRICHTUNG AUF MATRIZENSEITE | [2003/39] | English: | FORGING PRESS COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE ON THE MATRIX SIDE THEREOF | [2003/39] | French: | PRESSE A FORGER DOTEE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE SITUE COTE MATRICE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 30.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | IT | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | TR | 03.11.2004 | AT | 17.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | LU | 03.01.2005 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | CY | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
IT | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
AT | 17.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CY | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
AT | 17.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
AT | 17.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
AT | 17.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5994549 ; | [A]JPH0475742 ; | [A]JPH09295095 ; | [A]US3559446 (DOM HARRY A, et al) [A] 1,8,9,11,12 * column 5, line 3 - line 13 ** column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 5; figures 6,7 *; | [XA]US4137748 (GROMBKA WALTER J) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 33 - line 43 * * column 3, line 6 - line 18; figure - * [A] 6,7; | [X]US4170051 (BYAM ERWIN B [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 25 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US4791803 (BROQUET JOSEPH [CH], et al) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 6, line 28 - line 45; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840921), vol. 008, no. 207, Database accession no. (M - 327), & JP59094549 A 19840531 (SAKAMURA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 4,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920625), vol. 016, no. 287, Database accession no. (M - 1271), & JP04075742 A 19920310 (ASAHI OKUMA IND CO LTD) [A] 4,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09295095 A 19971118 (SAKAMURA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * |