EP1346604 - CONDENSER MICROPHONE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shure Acquisition Holdings, Inc. 5800 Touhy Avenue Niles, Illinois 60714 / US | [2004/17] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Shure Incorporated 222 Hartrey Avenue Evanston, IL 60202-3696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAY, Kelly Q. 3729 Corker Hill Way San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 02 /
GILBERT, Mark W. 2203 Parkside Drive Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US | [2004/25] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
KAY, Kelly Q. 6977 N. Ashland, Unit E Chicago, IL 60626 / US | ||
02 /
GILBERT, Mark W. 2203 Parkside Drive Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01985516.2 | 07.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001US46998 | Priority number, date | US20000745179 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 745179 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0251205 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346604 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04R19/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
H04R19/005 (EP,US);
H04R19/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDENSATORMIKROFONBAUGRUPPE | [2003/39] | English: | CONDENSER MICROPHONE ASSEMBLY | [2003/39] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE MICROPHONE A CONDENSATEUR | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 18.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 13.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2004 | 31.12.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Shure Incorporated 5800 Touhy Avenue Niles, Illinois 60714 / US | Date: | 27.02.2004 | [2005/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4142073 (AGNEUS NILS-ERIK, et al) [Y] 30 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 55 *; | [XY]US4993072 (MURPHY PRESTON V [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-10,22-29 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 43 * [Y] 3,11-21,30; | [A]US5740261 (LOEPPERT PETER V [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 57 *; | [Y]US5745438 (HILL JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 3,11-21,30 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 43 * * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 29 *; | [A]WO9965277 (MICROTRONIC AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-30* page 2, line 15 - page 10, line 3 * | International search | [Y]US4887248 (GRIEBELER ELMER L [US]); | [X]US4910840 (SPRENKELS ADRIANUS J [NL], et al); | [X]US6088463 (ROMBACH PIRMIN [DK], et al) |