Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1322752

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 28.09.2014
 BE 
 CH 
CYLapse: 07.04.2010
 DE 
 DKLapse: 30.09.2014
 ES 
 FILapse: 28.09.2014
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IELapse: 28.09.2014
 ITLapse: 28.09.2014
 LI 
 LULapse: 28.09.2010
 MCLapse: 30.09.2010
 NL 
 PT 
 SELapse: 29.09.2014
 TR 
Examination procedure23.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase22.04.2003National basic fee paid 
22.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200404   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2004
European patent granted07.04.2010
Opposition procedure17.12.2014Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.07.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:02.07.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:02.07.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:01.10.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:QIU, XIAO
 
Event date:01.10.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:HONG, HAIPING
 
Event date:03.01.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060418
 
Event date:07.04.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:07.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:12.05.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:20.05.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60141760
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20100520
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:15.06.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE
 
Event date:06.05.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20100430
 
Event date:20.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:23.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2343106 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100407
 
Event date:16.02.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Effective DATE:20110107
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100930
 
Event date:19.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:23.06.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:28.09.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100928
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20130926
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20130927
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20130926
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20130923
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20130926
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20130328
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.12.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20130923
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:08.01.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
OPPONENT:ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Effective DATE:20110107
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20130925
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20131025
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:11.02.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:11.02.2015 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20150211
 
Event date:11.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 60141760 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
 
Event date:13.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AELC
Code Expl.: MAINTAINED IN AMEND FORM
 
Event date:19.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 60141760 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
Effective DATE:20150211
 
Event date:20.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20140930
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150330
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140928
 
Event date:05.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:29.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60141760 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE
 
Event date:07.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20150330
 
Event date:15.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 463560 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20140928
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140929
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150211
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150403
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140928
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140928
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140928
 
Event date:29.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MP4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT DISCONTINUED IN PORTUGAL
Effective DATE:20150921
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150929
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140930
 
Event date:26.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR ML 20100401339 GR
Code Expl.:-LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20150403
 
Event date:21.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20100401339 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:27.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20160926
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20160926
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20160919
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:28.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:28.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
Effective DATE:20150421
 
Event date:28.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:27.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20200925
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20200928
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20200925
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:12.01.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60141760 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:HL KEMPNER PATENTANWALT, RECHTSANWALT, SOLICIT, DE
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20201127
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:09.01.2015 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272
 
Event date:05.03.2010 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:26.02.2010 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:23.10.2009 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:16.05.2003 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:09.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED
 
Event date:28.09.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 60141760 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:29.09.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20210927
 
Event date:20.10.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20210927
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210927
 
Event date:06.12.2013 
Event description:OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO
 
Event date:14.11.2011 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3
 
Event date:12.08.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2
 
Event date:26.04.2011 
Event description:NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2
 
Event date:14.01.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:30.09.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170928