EP1346098 - DEVICE FOR PRESSING SHIRTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMRATH, Joachim Raiffeisenstr. 7 89429 Bachhagel / DE | 02 /
WETZL, Gerhard Hohweierstr. 15 89567 Sontheim / DE | 03 /
SPIELMANNLEITNER, Markus Rosenberger Str. 49 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 04 /
REDLIN, Kathrin Haeselerstr. 17k 14050 Berlin / DE | 05 /
URICH, Bodo Filehner Str. 67 12555 Berlin / DE | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 01985834.9 | 29.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP13978 | Priority number, date | DE2000163669 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063669 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250359 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346098 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346098 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F73/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
D06F73/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | SI | 21.07.2003 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM GLÄTTEN VON HEMDEN | [2003/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRESSING SHIRTS | [2003/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEFROISSAGE DE CHEMISES | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1106284 (WICHITA PREC TOOL COMPANY INC) [A] 1,4,8,9 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE1164969 (HORST GESSNER) [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]US3595450 (SCHLEMON GEORGE, et al) [A] 1* column A; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE19607260 (OTTO EDGAR [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19754026 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |