EP1414513 - CATHETER FOR REMOVAL OF SOLIDS FROM SURGICAL DRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | [2009/14] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states The Cleveland Clinic Foundation 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIDDICOAT, John 110 Francis Street Suite 2A Boston, MA 02215 / US | 02 /
GILLINOV, Alan, Marc 120 Orange Tree Drive Orange Village, OH 44022 / US | 03 /
GOODIN, Mark, S. 34032 Summerset Drive Solon, OH 44139 / US | 04 /
BYERMAN, Bryan 1612 South Belvoir Boulevard South Euclid, OH 44121 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Roos, Peter, et al c/o Roospatent Noldinstrasse 7 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Roos, Peter, et al Klinger & Partner GbR Bavariaring 20 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01986082.4 | 02.11.2001 | [2004/19] | WO2001US45648 | Priority number, date | US20000245796P | 03.11.2000 Original published format: US 245796 P | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0238198 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1414513 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414513 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, A61M27/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61M27/008 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/22031 (EP,US);
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2217 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | A61M25/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | KATHETER ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON FESTSTOFFEN AUS CHIRURGISCHEN DRAINS | [2004/19] | English: | CATHETER FOR REMOVAL OF SOLIDS FROM SURGICAL DRAINS | [2004/19] | French: | SONDE SERVANT A ELIMINER DES PARTICULES SOLIDES DE DRAINS CHIRURGICAUX | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.2009 | BE | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | IT | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | ES | 12.07.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | IE | 02.11.2009 | LU | 02.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.11.2009 | ||
LU | 02.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 12.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4148319 (KASPER RICHARD F, et al) [X] 1 * column 10, lines 20-23 * [Y] 10-13,15; | [A]US4228802 (TROTT WILLIAM A) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4698058 (GREENFELD ALBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XY]US5370610 (REYNOLDS JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 4, lines 8-28 * * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 68; figures 4,5 * [Y] 10-13,15 | International search | [A]US5522801 (WANG ABE [CA]) |