|
24.10.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.04.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |