07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
26.10.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
12.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
14.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
17.11.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.05.2006 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.05.2006 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.11.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
First examination report |
|
05.07.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.12.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
09.12.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.12.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
06.06.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
30.05.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
30.05.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
17.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|