Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1327112 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2006 | B1 | EP1327112 | 16.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | EP0111348 | 01.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0114243 | 07.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | EP0111348 | 01.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50111705D1 | 01.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50111705 | 01.10.2001 | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | EP0111348 | 01.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0229339 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE348989T | 15.01.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1254652C | 03.05.2006 | C | CN1468359 | 14.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10049574 | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2276846T | 01.07.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10049574 | 06.10.2000 |