EP1325485 - METHOD FOR VERIFYING ANSWERS INPUT INTO A QUIZ COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states friends4media GmbH Yorkstrasse 8 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Merkur Media GmbH Neumarkter Strasse 28 81673 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Umediaentertainment GmbH Carl-Bertelsmann-Strasse 270 33311 Gütersloh / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNSICKER, Andreas Yorkstrasse 8 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, Dr, et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut Patentanwälte Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01986792.8 | 10.10.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001DE03900 | Priority number, date | DE20001050302 | 10.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10050302 | DE20011012322 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112322 | [2003/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0231797 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325485 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09B1/00 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
G06F15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Extension states | AL | 29.04.2003 | LT | 29.04.2003 | LV | 29.04.2003 | MK | 29.04.2003 | RO | 29.04.2003 | SI | 29.04.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERIFIZIERUNG VON IN EINEN QUIZRECHNER EINGEGEBENEN ANTWORTEN | [2003/28] | English: | METHOD FOR VERIFYING ANSWERS INPUT INTO A QUIZ COMPUTER | [2003/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE VERIFICATION DE REPONSES ENTREES DANS UN ORDINATEUR DE JEU A QUESTIONS | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.04.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Appeal following examination | 18.06.2010 | Appeal received No. T2006/10 | 09.09.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.08.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2003 | 31.10.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9957666 (UNSICKER ANDREAS [DE]) [DY] 1-19 * abstract * * page 8, line 14 - page 13, line L; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US4592546 (FASCENDA ANTHONY C [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5453015 (VOGEL PETER S [AU]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0474923 (SIGMA DELTA NV [BE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |