EP1325651 - CHANNEL ALLOCATION FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/19] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 03260 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMOS, Gabriel Paseo de Sancha, 28 E-29016 Málaga / ES | 02 /
SALMENKAITA, Matti URB, Casinomar, Portal 3, Bajo e E-29630 Benalmadena Costa, Malaga / ES | 03 /
LONGONI, Fabio Calle Severo Ochoa E-29590 Campanillas / ES | 04 /
D'ARGENCE, François Nokia France 97, avenue de Verdun 93230 Romainville / FR | 05 /
HALONEN, Timo, @c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02260 Espoo / FI | 06 /
MELERO, Juan Paseco Farola 8, 5-A 29016 Malaga / ES | 07 /
HAKALIN, Petter calle Salamanca, 104 Villa Vili La Capellania E-29639 Benamadena / ES | 08 /
TOLLI, Antti La Pergola 3F Paseo Colorado, 44 E-29620 Torremolinos / ES | 09 /
CORTES, Jose Antonio Calle Alcalde Joaquin Quiles 2 BJ. B E-29014Malaga / ES | 10 /
KANGAS, Arto, @c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 E-03260 Espoo / FI | 11 /
HOLMA, Harri Ripusuontie 92 C FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | [2011/50] |
Former [2003/28] | 01 /
RAMOS, Gabriel Paseo de Sancha, 28 E-29016 Málaga / ES | ||
02 /
SALMENKAITA, Matti URB, Casinomar, Portal 3, Bajo e E-29630 Benalmadena Costa, Malaga / ES | |||
03 /
LONGONI, Fabio Calle Severo Ochoa E-29590 Campanillas / ES | |||
04 /
D'ARGENCE, François Nokia France 97, avenue de Verdun 93230 Romainville / FR | |||
05 /
HALONEN, Timo, c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02260 Espoo / FI | |||
06 /
MELERO, Juan Paseco Farola 8, 5-A 29016 Malaga / ES | |||
07 /
HAKALIN, Petter calle Salamanca, 104, Villa Vili, La Capellania E-29639 Benamadena / ES | |||
08 /
TOLLI, Antti La Pergola 3F, Paseo Colorado, 44 E-29620 Torremolinos / ES | |||
09 /
CORTES, Jose Antonio Calle Alcalde Joaquin Quiles, 2 BJ. B E-29014Malaga / ES | |||
10 /
KANGAS, Arto, c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 E-03260 Espoo / FI | |||
11 /
HOLMA, Harri Ripusuontie 92 C FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Wegner, Hans, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01986835.5 | 09.10.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001IB02219 | Priority number, date | GB20000024705 | 09.10.2000 Original published format: GB 0024705 | GB20000027534 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0027534 | GB20010014965 | 19.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0114965 | GB20010015083 | 20.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0115083 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232173 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325651 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325651 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,BR,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,BR,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,BR,US);
H04W36/24 (BR);
H04W36/26 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/28] | H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Title | German: | KANALZUTEILUNG FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2003/28] | English: | CHANNEL ALLOCATION FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2003/28] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE CANAUX POUR SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2011 | 18.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5034993 (SASUTA MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 34* column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 13 *; | [X]EP0496061 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [X] 1-34 * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 37 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 2 * * figures 7-10A *; | [X] - ROZENSTRAUCH A ET AL, 2 PHASE RF CHANNEL ALLOCATION, MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, MOTOROLA INC. SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS, US, VOL. 24, PAGE(S) 70-71, (19950301), XP000500346 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0496061 | - "2 Phase RF Channel Allocation", ROZENSTRAUCH A ET AL., Motorola Technical Developments, MOTOROLA INC., (19950301), vol. 24, pages 70 - 71 |