EP1328201 - HAND-HELD INSTRUMENTS THAT ACCESS INTERIOR BODY REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyphon SÀRL rue du Puits-Godet 12/12a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Kyphon SARL Rue du Puits-Godit 12/12a 2000 Neuchatel / CH | ||
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Kyphon Inc. 1221 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Kyphon Inc. 1350 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REILEY, Mark, A. 304 Pala Avenue Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
REO, Michael 701 Baltic Circle, NO. 731 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
SCRIBNER, Robert, M. 7042 Quiet Retreat Court Niwot, CO 80503 / US | 04 /
FERDINAND, Arthur, E. 5423 Century Park Way San Jose, CA 95111 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Dee, Ian Mark Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01987231.6 | 23.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US46006 | Priority number, date | US20000695566 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 695566 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241796 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1328201 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328201 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/3417 (EP,US);
A61B17/8819 (EP,US);
A61B17/8822 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/8816 (EP,US);
A61B17/885 (EP,US);
A61B17/8855 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00261 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00429 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTE INSTRUMENTE FÜR DEN ZUGANG ZUM KÖRPERINNEREN | [2003/30] | English: | HAND-HELD INSTRUMENTS THAT ACCESS INTERIOR BODY REGIONS | [2003/30] | French: | INSTRUMENTS MANUELS D'ACCES AUX REGIONS INTERNES DU CORPS | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07076135.8 / EP1925261 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.02.2008 | CY | 06.02.2008 | DK | 06.02.2008 | FI | 06.02.2008 | NL | 06.02.2008 | SE | 06.05.2008 | GR | 07.05.2008 | PT | 07.07.2008 | AT | 23.10.2008 | GB | 23.10.2008 | IE | 23.10.2008 | IT | 23.10.2008 | LU | 23.10.2008 | ES | 24.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
AT | 23.10.2008 | ||
GB | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 24.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/08] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
AT | 23.10.2008 | ||
GB | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 24.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
GB | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
CY | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 06.02.2008 | |
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 06.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4013080 (FRONING EDWARD C) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2243788 (ISLAM ABUL BASHAR MOHAMMED ANW) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP0591851 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 18 *; | [A]WO9937212 (KYPHON INC [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [PX]WO0128439 (KYPHON INC [US]) [PX] 1-10* the whole document * |