EP1246688 - PASTE, WHICH CAN UNDERGO SCREEN PRINTING, FOR PRODUCING A POROUS POLYMER MEMBRANE FOR A BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inverness Medical Limited Beechwood Park North Inverness IV2 3ED / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Limited Beechwood Park North Iverness IV2 3ED / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIENE, Matthias 66 Crown Drive Inverness IV2 3QG / GB | 02 /
VON TIEDEMANN, Birgit 4 B Argyle Terrace Inverness, IV2 3HN / GB | 03 /
RODGERS, Jamie 30 Stratherrick Road, Lochardil Inverness IV2 4LL / GB | 04 /
MACGREGOR, Lucy 92 Miller Street, Inshes Park Inverness IV2 3DL / GB | 05 /
MCALEER, Jerry 52 Nobels Close Grove (Oxon) OX12 ONR / GB | 06 /
MCNEILAGE, Alan 31 Firth View Road Inverness, IV3 8LZ / GB | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
STIENE, Matthias 66 Crown Drive Inverness IV2 3QG / GB | ||
02 /
VON TIEDEMANN, Birgit 4 B Argyle Terrace Inverness, IV2 3HN / GB | |||
03 /
RODERS, Jamie 30 Stratherrick Road, Lochardil Inverness IV2 4LL / GB | |||
04 /
MACGREGOR, Lucy 92 Miller Street, Inshes Park Inverness IV2 3DL / GB | |||
05 /
MCALEER, Jerry 52 Nobels Close Grove (Oxon) OX12 ONR / GB | |||
06 /
MCNEILAGE, Alan 31 Firth View Road Inverness, IV3 8LZ / GB | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01987692.9 | 18.10.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001EP12073 | Priority number, date | DE2000152066 | 19.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10052066 | [2002/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232559 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246688 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246688 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/10, B01D71/16, B01D69/12, B01D69/14 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B01D67/0011 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/22 (KR);
B01D67/0013 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/122 (EP,US);
B01D69/1411 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIEBDRUCKFÄHIGE PASTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PORÖSEN POLYMERMEMBRAN FÜR EINEN BIOSENSOR | [2002/41] | English: | PASTE, WHICH CAN UNDERGO SCREEN PRINTING, FOR PRODUCING A POROUS POLYMER MEMBRANE FOR A BIOSENSOR | [2002/41] | French: | PATE POUVANT ETRE IMPRIMEE PAR SERIGRAPHIE, UTILISEE POUR PRODUIRE UNE MEMBRANE POLYMERE POREUSE POUR UN BIODETECTEUR | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.05.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2005/45] | MC | 31.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4425263 (NAZARENKO NICHOLAS [US]); | [X]US5607566 (BROWN RICHARD B [US], et al); | [XD]US5658444 (BLACK MURDO [GB], et al) |