EP1339617 - DISPENSING CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN Packaging Technology, Inc. 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states CROWN Packaging Technology, Inc 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Crown Cork & Seal Technologies Corporation 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGLUND, Sylvia, Maria 19 Northampton Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 9JZ / GB | 02 /
RAMSEY, Christopher, Paul Braeside, Manor Road Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 8DP / GB | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al Bryers Intellectual Property Limited Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | Smith, Debra Jane Clare, et al Carnaudmetalbox PLC, Downsview Road Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01987723.2 | 14.09.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001EP10658 | Priority number, date | EP20000309228 | 19.10.2000 Original published format: EP 00309228 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232776 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339617 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339617 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/26, B65D47/30 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
B65D47/26 (EP,US);
B65D47/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDERVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2003/36] | English: | DISPENSING CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER | [2003/36] | French: | BOUCHON DE DISTRIBUTION POUR RECIPIENT | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | FR | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | GB | 14.09.2006 | IE | 14.09.2006 | LU | 14.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
GB | 14.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
LU | 14.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
GB | 14.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
GB | 14.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5054634 (MARGOTTEAU JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1* column A; figure - *; | [A]US5356044 (LAVANGE DONALD [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * column A; figure - *; | [XA]WO9511172 (ZELLER PLASTIK KOEHN GRAEBNER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 4,5; | [A]DE19707416 (WEENER PLASTIK GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5996857 (MARKOS CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 4 *; | [X]US6053374 (SANTAGIULIANA EVANS [IT]) [X] 1-3,6,9,11 * column W * |