EP1327037 - BLIND, ESPECIALLY FOR COVERING A GLASS PANE OF A WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rowo Coating Gesellschaft Für Beschichtung MbH Allmendstrasse 7 79336 Herbolzheim / DE | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEFERT, Wolfgang Benfelder Strasse 5 77955 Ettenheim / DE | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Goy, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01987833.9 | 12.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001DE03929 | Priority number, date | DE2000151595 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10051595 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0233194 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327037 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327037 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/06, E06B9/42 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
E06B9/42 (EP,US);
E04F10/0607 (EP,US);
E04F10/0648 (EP,US);
E04F10/0655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLO, INSBESONDERE ZUR ABDECKUNG EINER GLASSCHEIBE EINES FENSTERS | [2003/29] | English: | BLIND, ESPECIALLY FOR COVERING A GLASS PANE OF A WINDOW | [2003/29] | French: | STORE DESTINE NOTAMMENT A RECOUVRIR LA VITRE D'UNE FENETRE | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.06.2004 | FI | 23.06.2004 | IE | 23.06.2004 | NL | 23.06.2004 | TR | 23.06.2004 | DK | 23.09.2004 | GR | 23.09.2004 | SE | 23.09.2004 | ES | 04.10.2004 | LU | 12.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | PT | 23.11.2004 | [2013/51] |
Former [2008/03] | CY | 23.06.2004 | |
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
TR | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
LU | 12.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
PT | 23.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CY | 23.06.2004 | |
FI | 23.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
TR | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
LU | 12.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
TR | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
ES | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
SE | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 23.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8704485 (NOMAFA AB [SE]) [Y] 8,10 * page 3, line 7 - line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0376817 (DAIMON CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,11 * column 4, line 24 - line 31 * * column 4, line 2 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,10; | [X]DE9300449U (LOSBERGER SONNENSCHUTZ GMBH) [X] 1,3-5,11 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0737795 (SCHMIDT MANFRED [DE]) [DA] 7,8 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 11 ** figure 2 *; | [X]DE19914543 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11 * column 4, line 48 - line 66 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19514019 | DE19531908 |