EP1336086 - PRESSURE MEASURING CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2013/10] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co.KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANHOLZER, Karl-Heinz Am Sportplatz 6 79688 Hausen / DE | 02 /
FLÖGEL, Karl Blasistrasse 42 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 03 /
HEGNER, Frank Chrischonastrasse 41 79540 Lörrach / DE | 04 /
ROSSKOPF, Bernd Hebelstrasse 13 79688 Hausen i.W. / DE | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | Andres, Angelika, et al Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 01987873.5 | 15.09.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001EP10684 | Priority number, date | DE20001052053 | 19.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10052053 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0233372 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336086 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336086 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
G01L9/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | DRUCKMESSZELLE | [2003/34] | English: | PRESSURE MEASURING CELL | [2003/34] | French: | CELLULE DE MESURE DE PRESSION | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2004 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | AT | 15.09.2013 | GB | 15.09.2013 | IE | 15.09.2013 | IT | 15.09.2013 | LU | 15.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 15.09.2013 | ||
GB | 15.09.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
IT | 15.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 15.09.2013 | ||
GB | 15.09.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
IT | 15.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 15.09.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
IT | 15.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 15.09.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 15.09.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | SE | 06.03.2013 | |
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03287037 ; | [A]US419219 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [A] 1-8 * page 8, line 5 - line 28; figure 4 *; | [A]US5050034 (HEGNER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920324), vol. 016, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1328), & JP03287037 A 19911217 (HITACHI CONSTR MACH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE2556947 | DE3128032 | EP0476309 | EP0516579 |