EP1446862 - MOTIONLESS ELECTROMAGNETIC GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patrick, Stephen L. 2611 Woodview Drive Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | For all designated states Bearden, Thomas E. 2311 Big Cove Road Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | For all designated states Hayes, James C. 16026 Deaton Drive SE Huntsville, AL 35803 / US | For all designated states Moore, Kenneth D. 1704 Montdale Road Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | For all designated states Kenny, James L. 925 Tascosa Drive Huntsville, AL 35802 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Patrick, Stephen P. 2611 Woodview Drive Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | ||
For all designated states Beardon, Thomas E. 2311 Big Cove Road Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | |||
For all designated states Hayes, James C. 16026 Deaton Drive SE Huntsville, AL 35803 / US | |||
For all designated states Moore, Kenneth D. 1704 Montdale Road Huntsville, AL 35801 / US | |||
For all designated states Kenny, James L. 925 Tascosa Drive Huntsville, AL 35802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/43] |
Former [2004/34] | Mabey, Katherine Frances Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01988155.6 | 06.11.2001 | [2004/34] | WO2001US43416 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041247 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446862 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446862 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K53/00, H01F29/14 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
H01F29/146 (EP);
H02K53/00 (KR);
H01F29/14 (KR);
H01F3/10 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/34] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSLOSER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER GENERATOR | [2012/08] | English: | MOTIONLESS ELECTROMAGNETIC GENERATOR | [2004/34] | French: | GENERATEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE STATIQUE | [2004/34] |
Former [2004/34] | BEWEGUNGSLOSER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE GENERATOR | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2004 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2009 | Decision despatched | 15.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2005 | 30.11.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2008 | 30.11.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2009 | 30.11.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2010 | 30.11.2011 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2012 | 30.11.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   01.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | IE | 06.11.2013 | LU | 06.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2018/48] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 23.12.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2831157 (HARRY GRAYSON, et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2866943 (RINGELMAN JOHN F) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]US3569947 (RADUS RAYMOND J) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 32 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2312135 (GALEY PAUL [FR]) [A] 1-26 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, column 13; figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE3640235 (HEYER HORST VON [DE]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 27 - column 3, line 19 *; | [A]US4883977 (REGAN DENNIS J [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-5 * |