|
19.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
178 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
178 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |