EP1352436 - RETICULATED AND CONTROLLED POROSITY BATTERY STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIANG, Yet-Ming 52 Lake Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
HELLWEG, Benjamin 57 Overhill Road Orinda, CA 94563 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01988312.3 | 22.10.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001US48345 | Priority number, date | US20000242124P | 20.10.2000 Original published format: US 242124 P | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0243168 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352436 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352436 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/00 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H01M4/13 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/74 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/04 (EP,US);
H01M4/0402 (EP,US);
H01M4/0404 (EP,US);
H01M4/0414 (EP,US);
H01M4/0416 (EP,US);
H01M4/0421 (EP,US);
H01M4/0423 (EP,US);
H01M4/0426 (EP,US);
H01M4/0428 (EP,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,US);
H01M4/0492 (EP,US);
H01M2004/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODEN MIT VERNETZTER ODER PORÖSER STRUKTUR | [2003/42] | English: | RETICULATED AND CONTROLLED POROSITY BATTERY STRUCTURES | [2003/42] | French: | STRUCTURES DE BATTERIE RETICULEES ET A POROSITE REGULEE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 24.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Request for further processing for: | 02.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | IE | 22.10.2008 | LU | 22.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CY | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
TR | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CY | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0071119 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 23 *; | [X]US4615784 (STEWART JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56.65 *; | [X]US5294504 (OTAGAWA TAKAAKI [US], et al) [X] 3-5,28* column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 61 *; | [X]US5821033 (CROMACK DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 3-5,28-57 * figure -; claim - * |