EP1539104 - USE OF IV EMULSIONS WITH DIFFERENT TRIGLYCERIDE COMPOSITION, PARTICLE SIZE AND APOLIPOPROTEIN E FOR TARGETED TISSUE DELIVERY OF HYDROPHOBIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK West 116th Street and Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKELBAUM, Richard, J. P.O. Box 651 Hastings-on-Hudson, NY 10706 / US | 02 /
CARPENTIER, A., Yvon Rue de Percke 110 B-1180 Brussels / BE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Lawrence, John Barker, Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01988430.3 | 28.12.2001 | [2005/24] | WO2001US50828 | Priority number, date | US20000258654P | 29.12.2000 Original published format: US 258654 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02053102 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539104 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON IV-EMULSIONEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHER TRIGLYCERID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, TEILCHENGRÖSSE UND APOLIPOPROTEIN E FÜR DIE GEZIELTE GEWEBEABGABE VON HYDROPHOBEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2005/24] | English: | USE OF IV EMULSIONS WITH DIFFERENT TRIGLYCERIDE COMPOSITION, PARTICLE SIZE AND APOLIPOPROTEIN E FOR TARGETED TISSUE DELIVERY OF HYDROPHOBIC COMPOUNDS | [2005/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE IV EMULSIONS COMPOSEES DE DIFFERENTS TRIGLYCERIDES, DE DIFFERENTES TAILLE DE PARTICULES, ET D'APOLIPOPROTEINES E, POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE COMPOSES HYDROPHOBES A DES TISSUS CIBLES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | 28.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4217842 (DIETL HANS [DE]) [X] 1-3,10-14,21-23,26 * example 2 *; | [X]WO9929316 (SEVERSON MARY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-14,21-23,26 * page 1, lines 4-9 * * page 5, lines 12-17 * * page 7, lines 1-14 * * examples 11,12 *; | [X]US6008248 (PSCHERER GERMAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-14,21-23,26,28 * column 4, lines 46-50 * * column 5, lines 6-25 * * table 2 *; | [X] - LINSEISEN J ET AL, "Antioxidant status of surgical patients receiving TPN with an OMEGA-3-fatty acid-containing lipid emulsion supplemented with alpha-tocopherol", CLINICAL NUTRITION (EDINBURGH), (200006), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0261-5614, pages 177 - 184, XP002310729 [X] 1-3,6-14,21-23,26,28 * table 2 * * page 181, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1 * | [DA] - TRESKOVA E ET AL, "BLOOD CLEARANCE AND TISSUE UPTAKE OF INTRAVENOUS LIPID EMULSIONS CONTAINING LONG-CHAIN AND MEDIUM-CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES AND FISH OIL IN A MOUSE MODEL", JOURNAL OF PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, US, (200009), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0148-6071, pages 253 - 257, XP001053210 [DA] 1-3,6-14,21-23,26,28 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US5650172 (MATSUDA SABURO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5789399 (STRUBE MARILYN E [US]); | [Y]WO9531181 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al); | [Y]US5028600 (JEPPSSON ROLAND I [SE]); | [Y]WO9221335 (KABI PHARMACIA AB [SE]) | [Y] - RENSEN ET AL., "Particle size determinates the specificity of apolopoprotein E-containing triglyceride-rich emulsions for the LDL receptor versus hepatic remnant receptor in vivo", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, vol. 38, pages 1070 - 1084 |