EP1348080 - ROLLING BEARING COMPRISING A POWDER METALLURGICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESWICK, John, Michael T. Elsenstraat 59 NL-3417 WX Monfoort / NL | 02 /
ZHOU, Xiao, Bo Carillonlaan 44 NL-3438 RH Nieuwegein / NL | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/40] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 01989061.5 | 06.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001NL00888 | Priority number, date | NL20001016811 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: NL 1016811 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0248565 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348080 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348080 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/30 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
F16C33/62 (EP,US);
F16C33/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER MIT EINER PULVERMETALLURGISCHEN KOMPONENTE | [2003/40] | English: | ROLLING BEARING COMPRISING A POWDER METALLURGICAL COMPONENT | [2003/40] | French: | PALIER A ROULEMENT A COMPOSANT METALLURGIQUE EN POUDRE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPH0925938 ; | [A]GB1357526 (SKF UK LTD) [A] 1 * column 2, line 77 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO9902873 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * claim 20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2352578 (TEXTRON INC) [A] 1 * page 3, column 11 - column 22 * * claims 9,13 *; | [A]JPH05239602 | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09025938 A 19970128 (NTN CORP) [DX] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931224), vol. 017, no. 708, Database accession no. (C - 1147), & JP05239602 A 19930917 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | Examination | US5108491 |