EP1371271 - PLASMA INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FUNCTIONAL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/08] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSE, Stefan Meterstrasse 4d 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
HENKE, Sascha Obere Talstr. 5/2 71263 Weil Der Stadt / DE | 03 /
SPINDLER, Susanne Rotebuehlstr. 170 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/51] | Application number, filing date | 01989368.4 | 05.12.2001 | [2003/51] | WO2001DE04565 | Priority number, date | DE2001104613 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10104613 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062115 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371271 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371271 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/30, H01J37/32 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H01J37/32357 (EP,US);
C23C16/513 (EP,US);
C23C16/515 (EP,US);
H01J37/32706 (EP,US);
H05H1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2010/08] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER FUNKTIONSBESCHICHTUNG | [2003/51] | English: | PLASMA INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FUNCTIONAL COATING | [2003/51] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PLASMA ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN REVETEMENT FONCTIONNEL | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07169758 ; | [A]US5241245 (BARNES MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8,11 * column 2, line 41 - line 59 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [YA]DE19603323 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 5,15 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 51 * * figure - * [A] 14; | [Y]DE19911046 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,4,8-11,18 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 63 * * figure . *; | [A]US6130397 (ARAI MICHIO [JP]) [A] 12,13 * column 3, line 13 - line 54 ** figure 11 *; | [XY]US6136139 (ISHII NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * column 15, line 30 - line 49 * * column 18, line 38 - line 44 * * figure 22 * [Y] 2,4,5,8-11,15,18 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07169758 A 19950704 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 6 * abstract * | Examination | US5355832 | by applicant | US6136139 |