EP1409855 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A SECONDARY AIR CHARGE AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SECONDARY AIR-CHARGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMMEL, Karl, Ernst Dianastr. 9 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2009/49] |
Former [2004/17] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01989440.1 | 07.11.2001 | [2004/17] | WO2001EP12848 | Priority number, date | DE2000164481 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064481 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052130 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409855 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409855 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/22, F01N3/32, F01N11/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N3/22 (EP,US);
F01N3/32 (EP,US);
F01N2550/14 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0283 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT SEKUNDÄRLUFTAUFLADUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES SEKUNDÄRLUFTLADERS | [2004/17] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A SECONDARY AIR CHARGE AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SECONDARY AIR-CHARGE ASSEMBLY | [2004/17] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A COMPRESSION D'AIR SECONDAIRE ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DU COMPRESSEUR D'AIR SECONDAIRE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.12.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | 08.12.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.12.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6193242 ; | [A]DE4120891 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 15 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0659986 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, column 1, line 25 - line 41 *; | [AD]WO9738212 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE], et al) [AD] 1,2,6-8 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 17; figures 2-11 *; | [DA]EP0800618 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,6-8* page 2, column 2, line 30 - column 2, line 42 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860913), vol. 010, no. 270, Database accession no. (M - 517), & JP61093242 A 19860512 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract * |