EP1347931 - GEARLESS CABLE LIFT WITH A DUAL WIND DRIVE DISK MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wittur AG Rohrbachstrasse 28 85259 Wiedenzhausen / DE | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTUR, Horst Waldstrasse 9a 85757 Karlsfeld/Rothschwaige / DE | 02 /
KÜNTSCHER, Dietmar Siebenbürgener Strasse 5 01257 Dresden / DE | 03 /
FICHTNER, Klaus Stephanienplatz 1 01307 Dresden / DE | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01989626.5 | 31.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001EP15380 | Priority number, date | DE2001100707 | 04.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10100707 | DE2001139339 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139339 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053486 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347931 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347931 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/00, B66B11/08 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B66B11/008 (EP,US);
B66B11/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBELOSER SEILAUFZUG MIT DOPPELT UMSCHLUNGENEN TREIBSCHEIBENANTRIEB | [2003/40] | English: | GEARLESS CABLE LIFT WITH A DUAL WIND DRIVE DISK MECHANISM | [2003/40] | French: | ASCENSEUR A CABLE A ENTRAINEMENT DIRECT, POURVU D'UN ENTRAINEMENT A POULIE MOTRICE A DOUBLE ENROULEMENT | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 24.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2006
10.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Ziehl-Abegg AG Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE Opponent's representative Maucher, Wolfgang, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2006
10.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Ziehl-Abegg AG Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE Opponent's representative Maucher, Wolfgang, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2006
10.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Ziehl-Abegg AG Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE Opponent's representative Maucher, Wolfgang, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2006
06.04.2006
ADMISSIBLE Ziehl-Abegg AG Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE Opponent's representative Maucher, Wolfgang, et al, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | 14.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.05.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 05.10.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | CY | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | DK | 05.01.2006 | GR | 05.01.2006 | SE | 05.01.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | DE | 01.07.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/13] | IE | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
DE | 01.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | IE | 05.10.2005 | |
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
DE | 01.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | IE | 05.10.2005 | |
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
DE | 01.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | IE | 05.10.2005 | |
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
DE | 01.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | IE | 05.10.2005 | |
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | DK | 05.01.2006 | |
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | DK | 05.01.2006 | |
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 05.01.2006 | |
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | PT | 06.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07117957 ; | [YA]EP0672781 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [Y] 1,3,7,8,10,15,17-21 * column 2, line 19 - line 40 * * column 5, line 43 - line 55 * [A] 2,4-6,9; | [AD]WO9943595 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [AD] 1,11-14 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO0027739 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,16* abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07117957 A 19950509 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,3,7,8,10,15,17-21 * abstract * |