EP1463600 - CORDLESS SOLDERING IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyperion Innovations, Inc. 2815 Eastlake Avenue E, Suite 300 Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXINTE, Dragos 18305 SE Newport Way M301 Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 02 /
AXINTE, Grigore 12562 SE 230th Street Kent, WA 98301 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01990183.4 | 14.12.2001 | [2004/41] | WO2001US48265 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051568 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463600 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/00 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B23K3/025 (EP);
B23K3/03 (EP,KR);
B23K3/02 (KR);
B23K3/0323 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 29.06.2004 | SI | 29.06.2004 | Title | German: | SCHNURLOSER LÖTKOLBEN | [2004/41] | English: | CORDLESS SOLDERING IRON | [2004/41] | French: | FER A SOUDER AUTONOME | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2504338 (MACLATCHIE JR ROBERT) [X] 1-12,14,18-25,27 * column 2, line 12 - line 32 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 63 - line 66 * * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 13,15-17,26; | [A]US2604571 (NAULTY HOWARD W, et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US4171477 (FUNARI JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4785793 (OGLESBY ALFRED P [IE], et al) [Y] 13,15-17,26 * column 14, line 10 - line 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]SU1590244 (ROSTOVSKIJ O Z TRESTA PROMAVTO [SU]) [A] 1-27* the whole document * | International search | [Y]SU1590244 (ROSTOVSKIJ O Z TRESTA PROMAVTO [SU]); | [Y]US2504338 (MACLATCHIE JR ROBERT); | [Y]US4171477 (FUNARI JOSEPH [US]); | [A]US2162615 (HARLAN GEORGE E); | [A]US3311736 (BURTON CHARLES A, et al); | [A]US3621193 (BANTA ROBERT D); | [A]US3032637 (WASSERLEIN HENRY G) |