EP1346179 - ULTRASONICALLY ENHANCED CONTINUOUS FLOW FUEL INJECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMESON, Lee, K. 115 Olive Street Roswell, GA 30075 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Bernard 381 Lakeshore Drive Berkeley Lakes, GA 30096 / US | 03 /
GIPSON, Lamar, Heath 2357 Nowlin Circle Acworth, GA 30102 / US | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01990266.7 | 20.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001US50253 | Priority number, date | US20000257593P | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 257593 P | US20010003154 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 3154 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052194 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346179 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/34, F02M69/04, B05B17/06 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
F02M69/04 (KR);
F02M69/041 (EP,US);
F23D11/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH ULTRASCHALL VERBESSERTE KONSTANTEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG UND SOLCHES KONSTANTEINSPRITZVERFAHREN | [2003/39] | English: | ULTRASONICALLY ENHANCED CONTINUOUS FLOW FUEL INJECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2003/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'INJECTION DE COMBUSTIBLE A FLUX CONTINU AMELIORE PAR ULTRASONS | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9723280 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-28,33-35 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 6 * * page 7, line 32 - page 10, line 15 * * claims 20,27 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6010592 (JAMESON LEE KIRBY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-17,22-24,26,27,29,33-35 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 40 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 33 * * claims 1-9 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO9723280 | WO9723726 |