EP1343824 - METHOD FOR IMMOBILISING BIOMOLECULES, FUNCTIONALISED CARRIER MATERIAL, AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolyAn Gesellschaft zur Herstellung von Polymeren für spezielle Anwendungen und Analytik mbH Rudolf-Baschant-Strasse 2 13086 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Poly-An Gesellschaft zur Herstellung von Polymeren für spezielle Anwendungen und Analytik mbH Rudolf-Baschant-Strasse 2 13086 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Poly-An Gesellschaft zur Herstellung von Polymeren für Spezielle Anwendungen und Analytik mbH Rudolf-Baschant-Strasse 2 13086 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESSIG, Pablo Triftstrasse 54 13353 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BENDIG, Jürgen Paul-Junius-Strasse 41 10369 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHEDLER, Uwe Torstrasse 2 10119 Berlin / DE | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Henry, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Schneider, Henry, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01990471.3 | 03.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001EP14072 | Priority number, date | DE2000165787 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065787 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051872 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343824 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1343824 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/06, C07K1/04 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C07K17/06 (EP,US);
C07K1/1072 (EP,US);
Y10S530/811 (EP);
Y10S530/813 (EP);
Y10S530/816 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG VON BIOMOLEKÜLEN, FUNKTIONALISIERTES TRÄGERMATERIAL UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2003/38] | English: | METHOD FOR IMMOBILISING BIOMOLECULES, FUNCTIONALISED CARRIER MATERIAL, AND THE USE THEREOF | [2003/38] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMMOBILISATION DE BIOMOLECULES, MATERIAU SUPPORT FONCTIONNALISE ET UTILISATION | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 10.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IE | 17.09.2008 | IT | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | LU | 03.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 17.02.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
TR | 17.09.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | DK | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | DK | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 17.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8905616 (BIO METRIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9116425 (SIGRIST HANS [CH], et al) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0017226 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1 * Schemata 0 und 1 (Seiten 3 und 5);; claims 9-12 *; | [A] - JAMES I W, "Linkers for Solid Phase Organic Synthesis", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990416), vol. 55, no. 16, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 4855 - 4946, XP004161079 [A] 1 * paragraphs [03.3] , [0000] , [0004] , [0000] , [07.6] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00125-8 |