EP1353692 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF OCULAR NEOVASCULARIZATION AND NEURAL INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKE, James, A. 2409 East Avalon Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 02 /
LIN, Ton 41 Capistrano Irvine, CA 92602 / US | 03 /
WHEELER, Larry, A. 18 Valley View Irvine, CA 92715 / US | 04 /
DE VRIES, Gerald, W. 25142 Bautista Drive Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01990804.5 | 01.11.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001US46014 | Priority number, date | US20000244850P | 01.11.2000 Original published format: US 244850 P | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0236162 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353692 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353692 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K41/00, A61K31/495, A61P27/02 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4168 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/502 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61K41/0057 (EP,US);
A61K41/0071 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K41/0057, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K41/0057, A61K31/415 (US,EP);
A61K41/0057, A61K31/495 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | A61K41/00, A61K31/495 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OKULARER NEOVASKULARISIERUNG UND NERVENVERLETZUNGEN | [2003/43] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF OCULAR NEOVASCULARIZATION AND NEURAL INJURY | [2003/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA NEOVASCULARISATION OCULAIRE ET DES LESIONS NERVEUSES | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 25.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | IE | 01.11.2009 | LU | 01.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
LU | 01.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SE | 25.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0040245 (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * page 23, line 2 - line 5; claim - * * page 10, line 10 - line 22 *; | [E]WO02064163 (QUADRA LOGIC TECH INC [CA]) [E] 1-25 * page 3, paragraph 5 ** page 6, line 5; claims 1-6,25,29 * |