Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010197895 | ![]() | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US47442809 | 29.05.2009 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | US55933606 | 13.11.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7608686 | ![]() | 27.10.2009 | B2 | US2007264689 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76735007 | 22.06.2007 | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7799543 | ![]() | 21.09.2010 | B2 | US2007178492 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US55933206 | 13.11.2006 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007073041 | ![]() | 29.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55929006 | 13.11.2006 | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007066805 | ![]() | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55928106 | 13.11.2006 | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007060742 | ![]() | 15.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | US55933606 | 13.11.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004516826 | ![]() | 10.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3065902 | ![]() | 21.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1407017 | ![]() | 03.06.2009 | B1 | EP1407017 | 14.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE432986T | 15.06.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2428242 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60138927D1 | 16.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1407017T | 21.09.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US0147018 | 05.11.2001 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003092164 | 15.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US806301 | 05.11.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0238766 | ![]() | 31.12.2003 | A3 | WO0238766 | 16.05.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009225798 | ![]() | 08.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2329012T | 20.11.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US31556501 | 29.08.2001 | US24644900 | 07.11.2000 | US30171501 | 28.06.2001 | US25713100 | 20.12.2000 |