30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
30.08.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
21.09.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
16.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.02.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
21.02.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
12.09.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
10.09.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|