EP1356509 - STRUCTURAL REINFORCEMENT OF HIGHLY POROUS LOW K DIELECTRIC FILMS BY CU DIFFUSION BARRIER STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Lawrence, D. 265 NW Silverado Drive Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Niederkofler, Oswald, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Niederkofler, Oswald, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | Niederkofler, Oswald A., Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01991604.8 | 18.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001US50808 | Priority number, date | US20000747701 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 747701 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0250894 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1356509 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356509 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/316 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01L21/02203 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,US);
H01L21/02362 (EP,US);
H01L21/31695 (US);
H01L21/76801 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/44] | H01L21/768 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | STRUKTURELLE VERSTÄRKUNG VON HOCHPORÖSEN SCHICHTEN MIT NIEDRIGER DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE DURCH KUPFER-DIFFUSIONSBARIERE-STRUKTUREN | [2003/44] | English: | STRUCTURAL REINFORCEMENT OF HIGHLY POROUS LOW K DIELECTRIC FILMS BY CU DIFFUSION BARRIER STRUCTURES | [2003/44] | French: | RENFORCEMENT STRUCTUREL DE FILMS DIELECTRIQUES FORTEMENT POREUX ET A FAIBLE CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE PAR DES STRUCTURES A EFFET DE BARRIERE A LA DIFFUSION DU CUIVRE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | IE | 18.12.2012 | LU | 18.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11111843 ; | [A]US5539240 (CRONIN JOHN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5814558 (JENG SHIN-PUU [US], et al) [Y] 11-19 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 13 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11111843 A 19990423 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 11-19 * abstract * | Examination | US6004863 |