EP1358263 - SILICA-FILLED RUBBERS COMPRISING A QUINONE DIMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexsys B.V. Zutphenseweg 10 7418 AJ Deventer / NL | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATTA, Rabindra, Nath De Haarmansenk 75 7433 HL Schalkhaar / NL | 02 /
HUNTINK, Nicolaas, Maria Van Hoornlaan 130 NL-7207 JL Zutphen / NL | 03 /
TALMA, Auke, Gerardus Burg. A. Bontekoelaan 21 7437 CP Bathmen / NL | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Beetz, Tom De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Beetz, Tom De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/45] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 01991761.6 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/45] | WO2001EP13834 | Priority number, date | EP20000204661 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00204661 | US20010265385P | 30.01.2001 Original published format: US 265385 P | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250180 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358263 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358263 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/29, C08K3/36, C08L21/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/29 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/29, C08L21/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILICIUMOXID-GEFÜLLTE KAUTSCHUKE MIT EINEM CHINONDIIMIN | [2003/45] | English: | SILICA-FILLED RUBBERS COMPRISING A QUINONE DIMINE | [2003/45] | French: | CAOUTCHOUCS CHARGES DE SILICE COMPRENANT UNE QUINONE DIIMINE | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | PT | 02.09.2008 | IE | 26.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
PT | 02.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9920687 (FLEXSYS AMERICA LP [US], et al) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO0005300 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - line 38 *; | [A] - DATTA R ET AL, "N-(1,3-DIMETHYLBUTYL)-N'-PHENYL-P-CHINONDIIMIN (Q-FLEX-QDI)-EINE MULTIFUNKTIONELLE CHEMIKALIE FUER DIE GUMMIINDUSTRIE", GUMMI, FASERN, KUNSTSTOFFE. INTERNATIONALE FACHZEITSCHRIFT FUR DIE POLYMER-VERARBEITUNG,GENTNER VERLAG. STUTTGART,DE, (200007), vol. 53, no. 7, ISSN 0176-1625, pages 457 - 463, XP000943611 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 462 * |