blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1346004

EP1346004 - COOLING AGENTS FOR COOLING SYSTEMS IN FUEL CELL DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WENDEROTH, Bernd
Sulzbacher Str. 13
69488 Birkenau / DE
02 / MESZAROS, Ladislaus
Walter Storck Str. 5
67112 Mutterstadt / DE
03 / DAMBACH, Stefan
Kaiserpfad 10a
67454 Hassloch / DE
04 / FIDORRA, Uwe
Erlenweg 6
67157 Wachenheim / DE
05 / BERGEMANN, Marco
Theodor-Mommsen-Str. 13
68766 Hockenheim / DE
 [2003/39]
Application number, filing date01991850.714.12.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001EP14786
Priority number, dateDE200016395120.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10063951
[2003/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02055630
Date:18.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1346004
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1346004
Date:23.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:C09K5/20, H01M8/04
[2003/39]
CPC:
H01M8/04029 (EP,US); C09K5/20 (EP,KR,US); B60L50/72 (EP,US);
B60L58/33 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP); Y02T10/70 (US);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLMITTEL FÜR KÜHLSYSTEME IN BRENNSTOFFZELLENANTRIEBEN[2003/39]
English:COOLING AGENTS FOR COOLING SYSTEMS IN FUEL CELL DRIVES[2003/39]
French:AGENTS REFRIGERANTS POUR SYSTEMES DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MECANISMES D'ENTRAINEMENT A CELLULES DE COMBUSTIBLE[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2003National basic fee paid 
21.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
26.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2006Fee for grant paid
04.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
LU14.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
LU14.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/20]FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/37]FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/25]FI23.08.2006
IE23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
Former [2007/10]FI23.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0105803  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [DX] 1-6 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 5 * * claims 1,4-6; tables 1,2 *;
 [A]US4684475  (MATULEWICZ WILLIAM N [US]) [A] 1-6 * example 2; table III * * claims 1,3,11,13 *;
 [DA]DE19802490  (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 7,8* the whole document *;
 [DA]WO0017951  (BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS [CA], et al) [DA] 7,8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.