EP1360562 - BURIED DATA STREAM IN A WIRELESS HOME NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states vpr Matrix, Inc. 7601 Penn Avenue S. Richfield Minnesota 55423 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states vpr Matrix, Inc. 7601 Penn Avenue S. Richfield, Minnesota 55423 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Best Buy Concepts, Inc. Trident Trust Co. (Cayman Ltd), One Capital Place, P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman, BWI / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Steven, K. 211 W. Minnehaha Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55419 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01992394.5 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001US50448 | Priority number, date | US20000746817 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 746817 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02052383 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360562 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/2871 (EP,US);
H04L67/289 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/567 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04H60/80 (EP,US);
H04L2463/102 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W84/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERGRABENER DATENSTROM IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN HEIMNETZWERK | [2003/46] | English: | BURIED DATA STREAM IN A WIRELESS HOME NETWORK | [2003/46] | French: | TRAIN DE DONNEES ENTERRE DANS UN RESEAU DOMESTIQUE SANS FIL | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5818441 (THROCKMORTON JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US5940073 (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN LEE [US], et al); | [Y]US6064376 (BEREZOWSKI DAVID MICHAEL [US], et al) |