EP1341519 - NON-ASPIRATING TRANSITIONAL VISCOELASTICS FOR USE IN SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc Bosch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARAKELLE, Mutlu 6713 Glen Meadow Drive Fort Worth, TX 76132 / US | 02 /
JINKERSON, David, L. 4383 Capra Way Benbrook, TX 76126 / US | 03 /
BRUNSTEDT, Michael R. W 110th Street Cleveland, Ohio 44102 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Anilbhai S. 104 NE 62nd street Seattle WA 98115-6535 / US | 05 /
CHAN, Kwan, Y. 4245 Arbor Gate Street Fort Worth, TX 76133 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/37] | 01 /
KARAKELLE, Mutlu 6713 Glen Meadow Drive Fort Worth, TX 76132 / US | ||
02 /
JINKERSON, David, L. 4383 Capra Way Benbrook, TX 76126 / US | |||
03 /
BRUNSTEDT, Michael, R. W 110th Street Cleveland, Ohio 44102 / US | |||
04 /
PATEL, Anilbhai, S. 4202 Brownwood Arlington, TX 76017 / US | |||
05 /
CHAN, Kwan, Y. 4245 Arbor Gate Street Fort Worth, TX 76133 / US | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01992564.3 | 05.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US44063 | Priority number, date | US20000246181P | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 246181 P | US20000246187P | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 246187 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0236096 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1341519 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K47/36, A61L31/04, A61L31/14 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
A61L31/042 (EP);
A61K47/36 (KR);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61K9/0048 (EP);
A61L2430/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/042, C08L5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | NICHT ASPIRIERENDE ÜBERGANGSVISKOELASTIKA FÜR DIE CHIRURGISCHE ANWENDUNG | [2003/37] | English: | NON-ASPIRATING TRANSITIONAL VISCOELASTICS FOR USE IN SURGERY | [2003/37] | French: | PRODUITS VISCOELASTIQUES TRANSITIONNELS NE NECESSITANT PAS D'ASPIRATION DESTINES A LA CHIRURGIE | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/12] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9924070 (FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,14-17 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; examples 3-6; claims 1-3,7,10,11,13 *; | [X]EP0214853 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,3,14 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 12 * * page 21, line 30 - page 23, line 16 * * page 24, line 19 - page 25, line 8; example -; claims 7,8,14 *; | [X]WO9425004 (WEBB BRADFORD C [US]) [X] 1,3,14 * page 6, line 25 - line 31; claim 1 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 6; example 1 *; | [X]US5792103 (SCHWARTZ DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,14 * column 4, line 5 - line 9 * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 5, line 9 - line 45 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 50; example -; claim 1 *; | [E]WO0240056 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [E] 1,3,6,7,14-16 * the whole document * |