EP1332058 - VEHICLE RETRACTABLE ROOF WITH PIVOTING ELEMENTS, SLIDING WITH TWO ARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles - SEBA 127, rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles - SEBA 127, Rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states France Design Lieu-Dit La Boujalière 79140 Cerizay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUEVEAU, Gérard "Amik Farm" F-79140 Le Pin / FR | 02 /
GUILLEZ, Jean-Marc "Les Maisons Blanches" F-79140 Cirières / FR | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/31] | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/32] | Geismar, Thierry Cabinet Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01992650.0 | 06.11.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001FR03434 | Priority number, date | FR20000014186 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0014186 | [2003/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236376 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332058 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332058 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1332058 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/02 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
B60J7/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | EINZIEHBARES FAHRZEUGDACH MIT SCHWENKELEMENTEN, DIE MITTELS ZWEIER ARME VERSCHIEBBAR SIND | [2003/32] | English: | VEHICLE RETRACTABLE ROOF WITH PIVOTING ELEMENTS, SLIDING WITH TWO ARMS | [2003/32] | French: | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE POUR VEHICULE A ELEMENTS PIVOTANTS, COULISSANTS AVEC DEUX BRAS | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 15.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.09.2006 | [2006/50] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2768024 (SPEAR JR ADRIAN G) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3903358 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE19930616 (CTS FAHRZEUG DACHSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 34; figures 1-10 * |