EP1330563 - METHOD FOR THE SPINNING AND WINDING OF POLYESTER FILAMENTS, POLYESTER FILAMENTS OBTAINED BY THE SPINNING METHOD, DRAW TEXTURING OF THE POLYESTER FILAMENTS AND BULKED POLYESTER FILAMENTS OBTAINED BY DRAW TEXTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANDEL, Dietmar Johannes-Machern-Strasse 4 63456 Hanau / DE | 02 /
DULLING, Achim Ziegeleiweg 12 51149 Köln / DE | 03 /
MIRWALDT, Ulrich Goethestrasse 131 63477Maintal / DE | 04 /
KLEIN, Alexander Im Bienengarten 4 55218 Ingelheim / DE | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01992806.8 | 02.11.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001EP12683 | Priority number, date | DE2000154422 | 03.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10054422 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236862 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330563 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330563 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
D01F6/92 (EP,KR);
D01F6/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPINNEN UND AUFSPULEN VON POLYESTER-FILAMENTEN, DURCH DAS SPINN-VERFAHREN ERHÄLTLICHE POLYESTER-FILAMENTE, STRECKTEXTURIERUNG DER POLYESTER-FILAMENTE SOWIE DURCH DIE STRECKTEXTURIERUNG ERHÄLTLICHE BAUSCHIGE POLYESTER-FILAMENTE | [2003/31] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SPINNING AND WINDING OF POLYESTER FILAMENTS, POLYESTER FILAMENTS OBTAINED BY THE SPINNING METHOD, DRAW TEXTURING OF THE POLYESTER FILAMENTS AND BULKED POLYESTER FILAMENTS OBTAINED BY DRAW TEXTURING | [2003/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE FILAGE ET D'ENROULEMENT DE FILAMENTS POLYESTER, DES FILAMENTS POLYESTER OBTENUS PAR CE PROCEDE DE FILAGE, ETIRAGE-TEXTURATION DES FILAMENTS POLYESTER ET FILAMENTS POLYESTER TEXTURES OBTENUS PAR ETIRAGE-TEXTURATION | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.03.2005 | FR | 23.03.2005 | GB | 23.03.2005 | IE | 23.03.2005 | NL | 23.03.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | AT | 02.11.2005 | CY | 02.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 02.11.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FR | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 02.11.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 02.11.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
GB | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [PA]JP2001020136 ; | [A]US3975488 (PATTERSON JOSEPH H) [A] 1-8* column W *; | [D]WO9927168 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al); | [A]EP1033422 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [D]WO0104393 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al); | [PA]WO0166836 (DU PONT [US]) [PA] 1-8 * the whole document * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001020136 A 20010123 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [PA] 1-8 * abstract * |