EP1332283 - INJECTION NEEDLE WITH ELASTIC NEEDLE TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRAS, Alwin Wirtsgasse 1 92363 Breitenbrunn / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Thomas Grossprüfening 20c 93049 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
YALCIN, Hakan Filchner Str. 33 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2003/32] | Application number, filing date | 01992835.7 | 30.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001DE04102 | Priority number, date | DE2000154183 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10054183 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236961 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332283 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332283 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/10, F02M61/18 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
F02M61/1873 (EP,US);
F02M61/047 (EP,US);
F02M61/10 (EP,US);
F02M2200/30 (EP,US);
F02M2200/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | EINSPRITZNADEL MIT ELASTISCHER NADELSPITZE | [2003/32] | English: | INJECTION NEEDLE WITH ELASTIC NEEDLE TIP | [2003/32] | French: | AIGUILLE D'INJECTION PRESENTANT UNE POINTE D'AIGUILLE ELASTIQUE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 07.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0932696 ; | [A]US4168804 (HOFMANN KARL) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 33 - line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0641931 (SERVOJET ELECTRONIC SYST LTD [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 22, line 17 - line 41; figures 1,8,12 *; | [X]DE19855568 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1,2,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09032696 A 19970204 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract * | Examination | JPS62162768 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871225), & JP62162768 A 19870718 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |