EP1334530 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN HT-PEM FUEL CELL DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING FUEL CELL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | |||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSE, Joachim In der Reuth 126 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
POPPINGER, Manfred Ruhsteinweg 5 91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 03 /
BRÜCK, Rolf Fröbelstr. 12 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
REIZIG, Meike Heisterer Str. 3 a 53579 Erpel / DE | [2003/33] | Application number, filing date | 01993034.6 | 31.10.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001DE04114 | Priority number, date | DE2000154050 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10054050 | [2003/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0237594 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334530 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/249 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER HT-PEM-BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE | [2003/33] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN HT-PEM FUEL CELL DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING FUEL CELL DEVICE | [2003/33] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE HT-PEM ET DISPOSITIF DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE CORRESPONDANT | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19721817 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4,20-25 *; | [Y]WO0059061 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 8 *; | [A]DE19630842 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 36-46 *; | [A]US4543303 (DANTOWITZ PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 45-54 * |