EP1338096 - METHOD OF CHANNEL FREQUENCY ALLOCATION FOR RF AND MICROWAVE DUPLEXERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Microwave, Inc. 6935-N Oakland Mills Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, John 5974 Pelican Hill Road Mt. Airy, MD 21771 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Xiao-Peng 2146 Stonewood Lane San Jose, CA 95132 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01993069.2 | 02.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US45560 | Priority number, date | US20000245538P | 03.11.2000 Original published format: US 245538 P | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0237708 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1338096 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338096 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/48, H04B1/52, H01P1/213 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
H01P1/20336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KANALFREQUENZZUTEILUNG FÜR HF- UND MIKROWELLENDUPLEXER | [2003/35] | English: | METHOD OF CHANNEL FREQUENCY ALLOCATION FOR RF AND MICROWAVE DUPLEXERS | [2003/35] | French: | PROCEDE D'ATTRIBUTION DE FREQUENCES DE CANAL POUR DUPLEXEURS RF ET MICRO-ONDES | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | FR | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | CY | 02.11.2005 | IE | 02.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
FR | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60223304 ; | [A]US5640042 (KOSCICA THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5923647 (DOLMAN RODNEY A [US], et al) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0932171 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0035042 (PARATEK MICROWAVE INC [US]) [A] 3,6,7,11 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 8 * * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 9 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 7 *; | [DX]US6111482 (ATOKAWA MASAYUKI [JP]) [DX] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860325), vol. 010, no. 075, Database accession no. (E - 390), & JP60223304 A 19851107 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 8-10 * abstract * |