EP1341882 - MIXED SURFACTANT CLEANING COMPOSITIONS WITH REDUCED STREAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Henkel KGaA Henkelstrasse 67, Postfach 1100 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITRA, Shumanta 4337 Sandyford Court Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 02 /
HAUBRICH, Scott 801 Chetland Road San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Boli P.O. Box 697 Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | [2003/37] | Application number, filing date | 01993170.8 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US44007 | Priority number, date | US20000253010P | 24.11.2000 Original published format: US 253010 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055641 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1341882 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
C11D3/378 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/044 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/3707 (EP);
C11D3/3723 (EP);
C11D3/3765 (EP);
C11D3/3773 (EP);
C11D3/3776 (EP);
C11D3/43 (EP);
C11D1/24 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF TENSIDMISCHUNGEN BASIERENDE REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT REDUZIERTER STREIFENBILDUNG | [2003/37] | English: | MIXED SURFACTANT CLEANING COMPOSITIONS WITH REDUCED STREAKING | [2003/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE LAVAGE A TENSIOACTIFS MELANGES A EFFETS DE TRAINEES REDUITS | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/21] | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2273300 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * page 5, line 1 - page 15, line 18; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [Y]WO9855570 (CLOROX CO [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 31 - page 7, line 15; example 1; claim - * * page 8, line 31 - page 10, line 23 *; | [Y]WO9855569 (CLOROX CO [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, line 26 - page 7, line 16; example 1; claim - ** page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 31 *; | [Y]EP0964056 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0010] , [0015] - [0017] - [0021]; tables 1,4 *; | [Y] - LANGE K. ROBERT, SURFACTANTS, MUNICH, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1999), 010261, XP002287103 [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [5.3.1] * | International search | [X]WO9822566 ; | [X]WO9923194 |