EP1355895 - COMPOUNDS FOR PEST CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health & Human Services Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Technology Transfer Office, 4770 Buford Highway, MS K-79 Atlanta, Georgia 30341 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health & Human Services Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Technology Transfer Office, 4770 Buford Highway, MS K-79 Atlanta, Georgia 30341 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUPIN, Gary, O. 1005 Dunlap Street Paris, TN 38242 / US | 02 /
KARCHESY, Joseph 1464 N.W. 15th Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 03 /
PANELLA, Nicholas, A. 2200 Trevor Street Fort Collins, CO 80521 / US | 04 /
DOLAN, Marc, C. 8533 Man O'War Drive Wellington, CO 80549 / US | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01993241.7 | 07.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001US47736 | Priority number, date | US20000254311P | 08.12.2000 Original published format: US 254311 P | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0250053 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355895 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355895 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/04, C07D303/32, C07C33/14, C07C47/225, A01N31/04, A01N43/20 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
C07D303/32 (EP,US);
A01N27/00 (EP,US);
A01N31/04 (EP,US);
A01N31/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/20 (EP,US);
C07C33/14 (EP,US);
C07C45/28 (EP,US);
C07C45/78 (EP,US);
C07C47/225 (EP,US);
C07C47/267 (EP,US);
C07C47/46 (EP,US);
C07C47/47 (EP,US);
C07C49/21 (EP,US);
C07C49/242 (EP,US);
C07C49/258 (EP,US);
C07C49/583 (EP,US);
C07C49/733 (EP,US);
C07C49/757 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/28, C07C47/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSVERBINDUNGEN | [2003/44] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR PEST CONTROL | [2003/44] | French: | COMPOSES POUR INTERVENTION PHYTOSANITAIRE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | IE | 07.12.2008 | LU | 07.12.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 07.12.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 07.12.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 07.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 07.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11240802 ; | [X]JPH1087409 ; | [DA]US5847226 (MULLER BERNARD [CH], et al) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1033076 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 20-63 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0128343 (UNIV LOUISIANA STATE [US], et al) [PX] 20-63* the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11240802 A 19990907 (TAISHO PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 20-63 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 24, Database accession no. 1998-266960, XP002208553 & JPH1087409 A 19980407 (FUJII) [X] 20-63 * abstract * | [X] - TELLEZ, MARIO R. ET AL, "Composition and Some Biological Activities of the Essen- tial Oil of Callicarpa americana (L.)", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY (2000), 48(7), 3008-3012, (2000), XP001097124 [X] 20-63 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf991026g | by applicant | WO9722575 | JPH1087409 | US5847226 | JPH11240802 | EP1033076 | WO0128343 | - TELLEZ ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2000), vol. 48, pages 3008 - 3012 | - Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacology, (1995), vol. 28 | - MAUPIN, G. O.; PIESMAN, J., J. MED. ENTOMOL., (1994), vol. 31, pages 319 - 21 | - KONST ET AL., FLAVOURS, (197503), pages 121 - 125 | - "IUPAC Information Bulletin Appendices on Tentative Nomenclature", SYMBOLS, UNITS, AND STANDARDS, (197612), no. 53 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1978), vol. 86, pages 1 - 8 | - MAUPIN, G. 0.; PIESMAN, J., J. MED. ENTOMOL., (1994), vol. 31, pages 319 - 21 | - PANELLA ET AL., J. MED. ENTOMOL., (1997), vol. 34, pages 340 - 45 | - BARNARD, D.R ET AL., J. ECON. ENTOMOL., (1981), vol. 74, pages 466 - 69 | - BARNARD, D.R. ET AL., J. ECON. ENTOMOL, (1981), vol. 74, pages 466 - 69 | - BROGDEN, W.G.; MCALLISTER, J.C., J. AM. MOSQ. CONTROL ASSOC., (1998), vol. 14, pages 159 - 64 |