EP1331926 - FAST-ACTING ANTIMICROBIAL LOTION WITH ENHANCED EFFICACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERIS INC. 43425 Business Park Drive Temecula, CA 92590 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states STERIS INC. 43425 Business Park Drive Temecula, California 92590 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, Nancy, E. 115 Wilson Court Pontoon Beach, IL 62040 / US | 02 /
PRETZER, Denise, K. 203 Parkhurst Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | 03 /
TIBBS, Kevin, A. 3818 Cleveland Avenue St. Louis, MO 63110 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Helbing, Jörg Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Helbing, Jörg Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus am Hauptbahnhof 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 50859 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993264.9 | 30.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001US48167 | Priority number, date | US20000710804 | 09.11.2000 Original published format: US 710804 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02055055 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331926 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331926 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50, C11D3/00, A01N31/00 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/44, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | SCHNELL WIRKENDE MIKROBIZIDE LOTION MIT VERBESSERTER WIRKSAMKEIT | [2003/32] | English: | FAST-ACTING ANTIMICROBIAL LOTION WITH ENHANCED EFFICACY | [2003/32] | French: | LOTION ANTIMICROBIENNE A ACTION RAPIDE POSSEDANT UNE EFFICACITE AMELIOREE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/49] | 16.11.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/32] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | CY | 30.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | FR | 31.10.2006 | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
GR | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
CY | 30.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
CY | 30.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 30.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5584167 ; | [X]US5298242 (VANLERBERGHE GUY [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,13-15,17-27,31 * column 3, line 41 - line 51 * * column 3, line 55 - line 68 * * column 4, line 10 - line 17 * * column 5, line 8 - line 13; examples A-B,K *; | [X]US5364625 (SEBAG HENRI [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,13,17-27,31 * column 3, line 50 - line 55; example 2 * * column 3, line 61 - line 65 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A]GB2338649 (HAWTIN BRIAN FRANCIS [GB]) [A] 1-31 * page 5, line 18 - line 22 * * examples 1,2; claims 1-13 *; | [E]EP1153544 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [E] 1 * page 3, line 8 - line 33 * * page 4, line 8 - line 17 * * page 4, line 21 - line 58 * * examples 1-4; claims 1-7; table 1 *; | [E]WO0187232 (ALWYN CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,13,17-26 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 1 - line 15 * * page 8, line 8 - line 25 * * claim 3 *; | [A] - "Medicament release sponge band contain non volatile oil high molecular component form emulsion water", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1980-55982C, XP002207135 & JPS5584167 A 19800625 (LION DENTIFRICE CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * abstract * |