EP1337613 - A CONTROLLED DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR FABRIC CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salvona L.L.C. 65 Stults Road Dayton, NJ 08810 / US | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEFER, Adi 14 Jason Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 02 /
SHEFER, Shmuel, David 14 Jason Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2003/35] | Lawrence, John Barker, Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01993666.5 | 01.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US47382 | Priority number, date | US20000709062 | 09.11.2000 Original published format: US 709062 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238713 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337613 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/46, C11D1/48, C11D1/62, C11D3/50, C11D3/37 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/37 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/35] | C11D1/46, C11D1/48, C11D1/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | 30.05.2003 | LT | 30.05.2003 | LV | 30.05.2003 | MK | 30.05.2003 | RO | 30.05.2003 | SI | 30.05.2003 | Title | German: | DOSIERSYSTEM FÜR WÄSCHEPFLEGEPRODUKTE | [2003/35] | English: | A CONTROLLED DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR FABRIC CARE PRODUCTS | [2003/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION REGULEE POUR PRODUITS DE TRAITEMENT DE TEXTILES | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | 14.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4152272 (YOUNG KENNETH [GB]) [X] 1-33* column 1, lines 34-43; examples 2,5-9 *; | [X]US4911851 (LADD JR JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * column 10, line 20 - column 11, line 24 *; | [X]US5460736 (TRINH TOAN [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * examples VI,VII *; | [X]US5536421 (HARTMAN FREDERICK A [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * column 27, lines 15-30; example VI *; | [X]US5932253 (TRINH TOAN [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * example 22 * | International search | [X]US5652206 (BACON DENNIS RAY [US], et al); | [X]US3896033 (GRIMM III JOHN EDWARD); | [Y]US6083899 (BAKER ELLEN SCHMIDT [US], et al) |