EP1332218 - DIFFERENTIATION-INDUCING SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediCyte GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 581 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2012/18] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Heart BioSystems GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 583 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Eberhard-Karls-Universität Tübingen Universitätsklinikum Geissweg 3 72076 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜPPER, Jan-Heiner Ostkirchstr. 50 47574 Goch / DE | 02 /
KANDOLF, Reinhard Untere Dornäcker 49 72379 Hechingen / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Ralph Rosengarten 7 55596 Waldböckelheim / DE | [2005/33] |
Former [2003/37] | 01 /
KÜPPER, Jan-Heiner Bachstrasse 11 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | ||
02 /
KANDOLF, Reinhard Untere Dornäcker 49 72379 Hechingen / DE | |||
03 /
MEYER, Ralph Rosengarten 7 55596 Waldböckelheim / DE | |||
Former [2003/32] | 01 /
KÜPPER, Jan-Heiner Bachstrasse 11 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | ||
02 /
KANDOLF, Reinhard Untere Dornäcker 49 72379 Hechingen / DE | |||
03 /
MEYER, Ralph Goethestrasse 1 72810 Gomaringen / DE | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperalle 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/23] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993692.1 | 31.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001EP12660 | Priority number, date | DE20001056059 | 11.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10056059 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238778 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332218 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332218 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERUNG AUSLÖSENDE SUBSTANZEN | [2003/32] | English: | DIFFERENTIATION-INDUCING SUBSTANCES | [2003/32] | French: | SUBSTANCES DECLENCHANT UNE DIFFERENCIATION | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2004 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | IT | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | ES | 25.06.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | IE | 31.10.2012 | LU | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 15.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - (20000830), URL: HTTP://WWW.CLONTECH.COM/TECHINFO/VECTORS/VECTORSF-, XP002193931 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 | [XY] - LEDO, "Development of a Transgenic Model to Assess Bioavailable Genotixicity in Sediments", (199904), URL: HTTP://WWW.WES.ARMY.MIL/EL/DOTS/PDFS/EEDP01-43.PDF, XP002193932 [X] 1-6 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere S.10/11 * [Y] 7,8 | [XY] - PRIMIG M ET AL, "A novel GFPneo vector designed for the isolation and analysis of enhancer elements in transfected mammalian cells", GENE, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199807), vol. 215, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 181 - 189, XP004149242 [X] 1-6 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Abb. 1 * [Y] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(98)00215-7 | [PXY] - LIU LI ET AL, "In vivo gene repair of point and frameshift mutations directed by chimeric RNA/DNA oligonucleotides and modified single-stranded oligonucleotides.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20011015), vol. 29, no. 20, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4238 - 4250, XP002193930 [PX] 1,3-6 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Abb. 1 * [Y] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.20.4238 |