EP1346523 - METHOD AND APPATATUS FOR PROCESSING OF MULTIPLE PROTOCOLS WITHIN DATA TRANSMISSION SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redback Networks Inc. 250 Holger Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUVVURU, Ramesh 6227 Grand Oakway San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 02 /
CHOW, Felix 955 Escalon Avenue, Apt. 613 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 03 /
SEE, Ricky 346 Sandhurst Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
NARAHARA, Sharath 925 Roselma Place Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 05 /
STILES, David 21108 Brush Road Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | [2003/49] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
DUVVURU, Ramesh 6227 Grand Oakway San Jose, CA 95135 / US | ||
02 /
CHOW, Felix 2694 Somerset Park Circle San Jose, CA 95132 / US | |||
03 /
SEE, Ricky 346 Sandhurst Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
04 /
NARAHARA, Sharath 925 Roselma Place Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | |||
05 /
STILES, David 21108 Brush Road Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01994414.9 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001US50087 | Priority number, date | US20000751255 | 30.12.2000 Original published format: US 751255 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063831 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346523 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEHRERER PROTOKOLLE IN DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSIGNALEN | [2003/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPATATUS FOR PROCESSING OF MULTIPLE PROTOCOLS WITHIN DATA TRANSMISSION SIGNALS | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES PROTOCOLES MULTIPLES DANS DES SIGNAUX D'EMISSION DE DONNEES | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2005 | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5533018 (DEJAGER GREGORY L [US], et al); | [A]US5550820 (BARAN PAUL [US]); | [AP]US6198751 (DORSEY PAUL C [US], et al); | [AP]US6237029 (MASTER PAUL L [US], et al); | [AP]US2001033580 (DORSEY PAUL C [US], et al); | [AE]US2002018468 (NISHIHARA MOTOO [JP]) |