EP1354331 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BARRIERS FOR A PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A.Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTINELLI, Armand 87 Impasse Jardins des Bérards F-38500 Coublevie / FR | 02 /
MARTINEZ, Jean-Claude 2 allée des Chênes F-35131 Chartres de Bretagne / FR | [2003/47] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
BETTINELLI, Armand 58 avenue d'Haussez F-38500 Voiron / FR | ||
02 /
MARTINEZ, Jean-Claude 2 allée des Chênes F-35131 Chartres de Bretagne / FR | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/43] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson multimedia European Patents Operations 46, quai Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01994829.8 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001EP15260 | Priority number, date | FR20000016838 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016838 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052602 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354331 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354331 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/24, H01J17/16 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H01J9/242 (EP,US);
H01J9/24 (KR);
H01J11/10 (EP,US);
H01J11/36 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROZESS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BARRIEREN FÜR EINE PLASMA-ANZEIGETAFEL | [2003/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BARRIERS FOR A PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL | [2003/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BARRIERES POUR UN ECRAN D'AFFICHAGE A PLASMA | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11283497 ; | [A]JPH11219659 ; | [A]US5714840 (TANABE RYUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 5 - line 18 * * column 4, line 46 - line 51 * * column 5, line 37 - line 43; table 2 *; | [A]EP1017083 (THOMSON PLASMA [FR]) [A] 1,12 * column 5, line 25 - line 55 * * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11283497 A 19991015 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11219659 A 19990810 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 12 * abstract * |