EP1346153 - HYDRAULIC MOTOR DEVICE WITH DISPLACEMENT SELECTOR AND A BRAKING SYSTEM. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POCLAIN HYDRAULICS INDUSTRIE Route de Saint Sauveur 60411 Verberie / FR | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGO, Louis 33 Bis, rue St Germain F-60200 Compiègne / FR | 02 /
RUZICKA, Daniel Résidence Henri IV, 7, rue du Docteur Schweitzer F-60180 Nogent-sur-Oise / FR | 03 /
ALLART, Bernard 39, rue Renoir F-60800 Crepy-en-Valois / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Intès, Didier Gérard André Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01994929.6 | 20.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001FR04097 | Priority number, date | FR20000017171 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0017171 | [2003/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053907 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346153 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346153 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F03C1/04 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
F16D63/006 (EP,US);
F03C1/045 (EP,US);
F16H2063/3033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKMOTORVORRICHTUNG MIT HUBVOLUMENWAHLVORRICHTUNG UND BREMSSYSTEM | [2003/39] | English: | HYDRAULIC MOTOR DEVICE WITH DISPLACEMENT SELECTOR AND A BRAKING SYSTEM. | [2003/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE AYANT UN SELECTEUR DE CYLINDREE ET UN SYSTEME DE FREINAGE. | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | IE | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | LU | 20.12.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
LU | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
SE | 26.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2655090 (POCLAIN HYDRAULICS SA [FR]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DX]FR2673684 (POCLAIN HYDRAULICS SA [FR]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * * claim 1 * | by applicant | FR1463911 | FR2655090 | FR2673684 | FR2780450 | EP1058002 |