EP1354584 - PREVENTIVES FOR ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGIRI, Ryusuke, c/o Tsukuba Research Lab. Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd, 2, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 02 /
KAMIYA, Toshikazu, c/o Tsukuba Research Lab. Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd, 2, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01995025.2 | 27.12.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001JP11540 | Priority number, date | JP20010000393 | 05.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001000393 | [2003/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055073 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354584 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/401, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, A23L1/305, A23K1/16, C07D207/16 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A21D2/245 (EP,US);
A23D7/0056 (EP,US);
A23G3/44 (EP,US);
A23G4/06 (EP,US);
A23G4/14 (EP,US);
A23K20/142 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A61K31/401 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | 30.07.2003 | LT | 30.07.2003 | LV | 30.07.2003 | MK | 30.07.2003 | RO | 30.07.2003 | SI | 30.07.2003 | Title | German: | PRÄVENTIVA FÜR ARTHRITIS | [2003/43] | English: | PREVENTIVES FOR ARTHRITIS | [2003/43] | French: | AGENTS PROPHYLACTIQUES DE L'ARTHRITE | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2003 | Translation filed | 30.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4208421 (LAUZANNE-MORELLE ELIANE [FR], et al) [A] * claims 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US3891765 (COIRRE PAUL, et al); | [Y]WO9115487 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [Y]WO0044733 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X]JPH0597798 (ORION MACHINERY CO LTD); | [X]JPS63218649 (JIYAN MORERU, et al) | [Y] - MAZIERES, B., "Effects of N-acetyl hydroxyproline (oxaceprol(R)) on an experimental post-contusive model of osteoarthritis. A pathological study", J. DRUG. DEV., (1990), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 135 - 142, XP002950166 | Examination | - PARNHAM M.J., "Antirheumatic Agents and Leukocyte Recruitment. New light on the mechanism of action of oxaceprol", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL, (1999), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 209 - 215 |