EP1349819 - COMPOSITION WHICH IS INTENDED FOR USE AS AN ADDITIVE FOR CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mega-Tech Holding B.V. Plaza 24 4782 SK Moerdijk / NL | [2005/05] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Mega-Tech Holding B.V. Einsteinstraat 16 G 3316 GG Dordrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LA ROIJ, Robin Einsteinstraat 16 G NL-3316 GG Dordrecht / NL | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/41] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 01995061.7 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001NL00913 | Priority number, date | NL20001016892 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: NL 1016892 | [2003/41] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0248067 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349819 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349819 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B22/12, C04B28/02, // (C04B28/02, 14:04, 22:08, 22:12) | [2003/41] | CPC: |
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
C04B22/12 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00732 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B22/12 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B14/047, C04B14/06, C04B22/064, C04B22/066, C04B22/10, C04B22/12, C04B22/124, C04B22/142, C04B22/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | 16.06.2003 | LT | 16.06.2003 | LV | 16.06.2003 | MK | 16.06.2003 | RO | 16.06.2003 | SI | 16.06.2003 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ZEMENTZUSATZ | [2003/41] | English: | COMPOSITION WHICH IS INTENDED FOR USE AS AN ADDITIVE FOR CEMENT | [2003/41] | French: | COMPOSITION SERVANT D'ADDITIF A CIMENT | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2002 | Translation filed | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 18.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPS6111117 ; | [DA]CN1121494 ; | [A]BE413484 (J. GENIN ET AL.) [A] 1,2,9 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000016858 ; | [A]CH255040 (GROSSMANN ARMAND [CH]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2929729 (WAGGONER HOMER F) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]CH496528 (T A MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | JPS4932917 [ ] (FUJIMASO); | JPS52117316 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | JPS5735743 [ ] (MEISEI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | SU1182155 [ ] (KRAMATORSK IND INST [SU]); | JPS60229984 [ ] (NIHON SOIRU KK); | [DX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 09, Database accession no. 1986-059199, XP002175239 & JPS6111117 A 19860118 (TANAKA Y) [DX] 1,2 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 45, Database accession no. 1997-481326, XP002175240 & CN1121494 A 19960501 (QI G) [DA] 1,2,9 * abstract * | [A] - FUJIMASO ET AL., "Cement composition useful for solidifying soil, waste sludge and other industrial waste materials", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, vol. 81, no. 16, ISSN 0009-2258, XP000183225 [A] 1,3,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - TAGUCHI YOSHIO ET AL., "Strengthening of soil", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, vol. 105, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2258, XP000183849 [A] 1,2 | [A] - PISARENKO ET AL, "plugging mortar", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860224), vol. 104, no. 8, Database accession no. 55347q, XP000064446 [A] 1,3,8 * abstract * | [A] - MASAMOTO, "cement products with improved efflorescence resistance", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780403), vol. 88, no. 14, Database accession no. 93888a, XP000059667 [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 15, Database accession no. 2000-164013, XP002195380 & JP2000016858 A 20000118 (SAITO F) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - FUJITA SADAO, "Soil solidifying agent", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, vol. 97, no. 26, ISSN 0009-2258, XP000183951 [A] 1 * abstract * |