EP1335734 - METHOD FOR TREATING HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bass, Ralph L. 3708 Sweeten Creek Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [2003/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Frith, Richard William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Frith, Richard William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01995308.2 | 20.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001US45484 | Priority number, date | US20000721131 | 22.11.2000 Original published format: US 721131 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0241904 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335734 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K33/14, A61K33/42, A61K38/00, A61P31/18 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/14, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/34] | A61K33/00, A61K33/14, A61K33/42, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Extension states | AL | 02.06.2003 | LT | 02.06.2003 | LV | 02.06.2003 | MK | 02.06.2003 | RO | 02.06.2003 | SI | 02.06.2003 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIV | [2003/34] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING HIV | [2003/34] | French: | M THODE DE TRAITEMENT DU VIH | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 13.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 06, & JP9040580 A 19970210 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATL GMBH) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | International search | [Y] - REYNOLDS, J.E.F., "Electrolytes", MARTINDALE: THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA, 13TH EDITION (LONDON), (1993), pages 851 - 863, 1033, 1034, XP002909565 | [Y] - CHAISSON ET AL., "Principles and practice of infectious diseases", (1995), pages 1217 - 1253, XP002909566 | [Y] - BAUM ET AL., "High risk of HIV-related mortality is associated with selenium deficieny", EMBASE, Database accession no. 97328641, XP002909564 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROMES & HUMAN RETROVIROLOGY, (199708), vol. 154, no. 5, pages 370 - 374 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Purex and TFC purex salts", MORTON SALT PRODUCT DATA, (199505), page 1, XP002909572 |